SB1084 (CH0709)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and Penalties

Sponsored by:

Senator Waugh

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/16/20172/16/2017First Reading Senate Rules
2/21/20172/22/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/20172/22/2017Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable with Amendments {834632/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/20/20173/18/2017Third Reading Passed (47-0)47
House3/21/20173/18/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations52
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {646985/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (46-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 709

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 25, 2017 12:51 P.M.