SB1089

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Primary and Secondary Education - Health and Safety Guidelines and Procedures - Digital Devices

Sponsored by:

Senator Hershey

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/16/20172/16/2017First Reading Senate Rules
2/21/20172/22/2017Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/20172/22/2017Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.