SB1106 (CH0467)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Simonaire

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/22/20162/22/2016First Reading Senate Rules
3/9/20163/10/2016Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/1/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments {428974/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/4/20163/29/2016Third Reading Passed (45-0)58
House4/5/20163/29/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations61
4/6/20164/6/2016Rereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
Rereferred to Judiciary
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed (141-0)68
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/10/20165/10/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.