SB1108

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings

Sponsored by:

Senator Salling

Status:

In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/22/20162/22/2016First Reading Senate Rules
3/1/20163/2/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/9/20163/9/2016Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
4/7/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments {359835/1 Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61
4/8/20164/2/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)62
House4/8/20164/2/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations65
4/9/20164/9/2016Rereferred to Ways and Means
Hearing 4/11 at 9:00 a.m.
4/11/20164/11/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.