SB1125

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement Act

Sponsored by:

Senator Ferguson

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/26/20162/26/2016First Reading Senate Rules
3/1/20163/2/2016Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
3/11/20163/11/2016Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
3/28/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {169835/153
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted53
3/29/20163/25/2016Favorable with Amendments {169835/1 Adopted54
Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 54
Floor Amendment (Senator McFadden) {323627/1 Adopted54
Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {423123/1 Rejected54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/30/20163/26/2016Third Reading Passed (32-13)55
House3/31/20163/26/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations58
4/4/20164/4/2016Rereferred to Ways and Means
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable Report by Ways and Means
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/9/20164/4/2016Third Reading Passed (87-47)67
Senate4/11/20164/3/2016Returned Passed63A
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/18/20171/18/2017Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.