HB0069

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption

Sponsored by:

Delegate Fisher

Status:

In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Exempting from the Calvert County property tax specified personal property purchased by businesses from July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2018; exempting specified personal property from the Calvert County property tax beginning on July 1, 2018; providing that specified personal property remains subject to the Calvert County property tax; providing that specified personal property subject to a payment in lieu of taxes agreement shall be subject to the Calvert County property tax on the termination of the agreement; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Fisher and O'Donnell
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0841
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0573 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Property - Local
Narrow Subject(s):Bingo
Cable Television
Calvert County
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Exemptions
Local Government Mandates
Personal Property
Property Tax
Railroads
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water
Statutes:Article - Tax - Property
(7-402)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 20, 2015 7:16 P.M.