HB0386

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems

Sponsored by:

Delegate Reznik

Status:

In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs of specified energy storage systems installed on or after January 1, 2016, but before January 1, 2021; providing that the credit may not exceed a specified amount; providing that the credit may not be carried forward to another taxable year; requiring a taxpayer claiming the credit to attach proof of the total installed costs to the taxpayer's return; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Reznik, Fraser-Hidalgo, Barve, Kramer, and Luedtke
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0834
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Sou; Fuel; Power Plants
Income Tax
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Storage
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-719)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:59 P.M.