HB1142

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clagett

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Reducing, beginning after December 31, 2013, but before January 1, 2019, the State income tax rate on the Maryland taxable income of corporations that incorporate in or relocate to the State on or after January 1, 2014.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Clagett, Beitzel, Bohanan, DeBoy, Eckardt, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Olszewski, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Schulz, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Wood, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Ways and Means   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Corporations -see also- Municipal Corps; Public Corps & Inst
Income Tax
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:52 P.M.