HB1533

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on Child Custody Decision Making - Extension

Sponsored by:

Delegate Dumais

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Requiring the Commission on Child Custody Decision Making to submit an additional interim report of its findings and recommendations on or before December 31, 2014, and a final report of its findings and recommendations December 1, 2015, respectively; extending the termination date of the Commission from December 31, 2014, to December 31, 2015.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Dumais
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Committee(s):
Judiciary   View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Child Custody
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 2, 2015 9:05 A.M.