Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session



Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums

Sponsored by:

Senator Klausmeier


In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.

Synopsis:Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a maximum of $250 for taxable years beginning January 1, 2016, and January 1, 2017, and a maximum of $500 for the taxable year beginning January 1, 2018, and for each taxable year thereafter; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Klausmeier
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0822
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0478 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Budget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Long-Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes
Tax Credits -see also- Circuit Breaker
Statutes:Article - Tax - General

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions

November 20, 2015 7:22 P.M.