Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0370Alcoholic Beverages - On-Premises Promotions and Product Sampling - Holders of Manufacturer's LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0520
    (SB1068)
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery PermitDelegate MautzIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0550
    (SB0410 / CH0068)
Distillery License Holders - Sale of Product to Participants in Guided ToursDelegate ClippingerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0598Alcoholic Beverages - Distribution and Sales Tax RevenuesDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0616Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0733 / CH0627Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Manufacturer's Licenses - Sampling, Sale, and Consumption of ProductsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 627Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0739 / CH0628Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit - RevisionsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0749Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - ProhibitionDelegate LamIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0931Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine LicensesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1196Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1239Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License - On-Premises ConsumptionDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1316 / CH0308Alcoholic Beverages - Class 9 Limited Distillery LicensesDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1337 / CH0310Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and PermitsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0410 / CH0068
    (HB0550)
Distillery License Holders - Sale of Product to Participants in Guided ToursSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0587 / CH0564Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - ProhibitionSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0630 / CH0418Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival PermitSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0724 / CH0041Alcoholic Beverages ArticlePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0725 / CH0228Alcoholic Beverages - Cross-References and CorrectionsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1064Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1068
    (HB0520)
Alcoholic Beverages - Auxiliary Winery PermitSenator EckardtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.