Operating Budget (B1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0114Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0160
    (SB0170 / CH0462)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2015)SpeakerIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriations
HB0162
    (SB0172 / CH0464)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0560Task Force to Study Federal Funding in MarylandDelegate BatesIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0711Transfer Tax Revenues - Special Fund Transfers - Two-Thirds VoteDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0754Dedicated State Funds Protection ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0998
    (SB0647)
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - ProhibitionDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1110Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1274Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
HB1340Education - Calculation of State Appropriation - Information Transparency in Budget BooksDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0170 / CH0462
    (HB0160)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2015)PresidentEnacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 462Budget and Taxation Appropriations
SB0172 / CH0464
    (HB0162)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB0628Task Force to Study the Needs and Expenditures of State ProgramsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0647
    (HB0998)
Public Higher Education - Use of Funds - ProhibitionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0726Education - State Funding - Operating and Capital FundsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0821Digital Equity for All Maryland Students Act of 2014Senator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.