Operating Budget (B1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0110
    (SB0745)
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - FundingDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0120 / CH0095State Budget - Department of Budget and Management - Statement of Dedicated State FundsDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0144
    (SB0337 / CH0549)
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - FundingDelegate HixsonIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0150
    (SB0190 / CH0143)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017)SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
HB0368 / CH0015
    (SB0370 / CH0014)
Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016Delegate KormanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0449
    (SB0375)
Relief From Budget MandatesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0753
    (SB0808)
State BudgetDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1176Rental Deposit Assistance Loan Programs and FundDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1375Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1456Public Schools - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0190 / CH0143
    (HB0150)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2017)PresidentEnacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 143Budget and TaxationAppropriations
SB0337 / CH0549
    (HB0144)
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - FundingSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0370 / CH0014
    (HB0368 / CH0015)
Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016Senator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0375
    (HB0449)
Relief From Budget MandatesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0745
    (HB0110)
Law Enforcement Explorer Program - FundingSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0808
    (HB0753)
State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.