Prior Authorizations (B4)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0074 / CH0021
    (SB0782 / CH0087)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High StadiumDelegate GrammerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1579 / CH0510
    (SB1099 / CH0511)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life CenterBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 510Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0782 / CH0087
    (HB0074 / CH0021)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High StadiumSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1099 / CH0511
    (HB1579 / CH0510)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016 - Baltimore County - Morning Star Family Life CenterSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 511Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.