Capital Budget (B5)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0071 / CH0495
    (SB0056)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495 (Line Item Veto)AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
HB0130
    (SB0601 / CH0371)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsDelegate JonesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0210
    (SB0268)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0900
    (SB0492)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/16/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
HB0923
    (SB0490 / CH0355)
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable ClassroomsDelegate HixsonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1182 / CH0471
    (SB0821)
Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0056
    (HB0071 / CH0495)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
SB0171Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road PropertySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0268
    (HB0210)
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipSenator HoughIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0490 / CH0355
    (HB0923)
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable ClassroomsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0492
    (HB0900)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Cornerstone Montgomery and Interfaith Works ProjectSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/16/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
SB0601 / CH0371
    (HB0130)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0821
    (HB1182 / CH0471)
Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.