Capital Budget (B5)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0151 / CH0022
    (SB0171)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
HB0153 / CH0032
    (SB0197)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0467 / CH0782
    (SB0699)
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship ActDelegate McCrayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB0717 / CH0143Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0171
    (HB0151 / CH0022)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
SB0197
    (HB0153 / CH0032)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0699
    (HB0467 / CH0782)
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship ActSenator RosapepeIn the House - Second Reading PassedFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB1198 / CH0019Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017Prince George's County SenatorsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:14 P.M.