Corporations and Associations (C1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0135Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and AffidavitDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0201Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Resident Agent and Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0354 / CH0171
    (SB0148 / CH0170)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From LiabilityDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0457
    (SB0385)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsSpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0812
    (SB0432)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1378 / CH0324
    (SB1007 / CH0323)
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and TrustDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 324Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1419
    (SB0034)
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined ReportingDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1444 / CH0652Mary Byrd Wyman Memorial Association of Baltimore CityDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1446 / CH0653State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Recordation of Governing and Charter Documents - ProhibitionsDelegate McComasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 653Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1513
    (SB1056)
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by MergerDelegate KramerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1544
    (SB1065)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0034
    (HB1419)
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined ReportingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0066 / CH0335Professional Corporations - Approval of Corporate Name by Licensing Unit and Professional Organization - ExemptionSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0148 / CH0170
    (HB0354 / CH0171)
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Directors and Trustees - Duties and Immunity From LiabilitySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0385
    (HB0457)
Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0432
    (HB0812)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2016Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0501Shareholders United ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1007 / CH0323
    (HB1378 / CH0324)
Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program and TrustSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 323Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic Matters
SB1056
    (HB1513)
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by MergerSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1065
    (HB1544)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.