Corporations and Associations (C1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0215County Revenues - Business Fees and Personal Property Tax ExemptionDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0268Personal Property Tax and Annual Report Filing Fee - ExemptionDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0589Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Corporate Bylaws and Elections of Directors and TrusteesDelegate FrickIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0615
    (SB0357)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0691Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Filing Fee Fairness Act of 2017)Delegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0714
    (SB0656)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution - RepealDelegate ClarkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0744 / CH0674
    (SB0481)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0759 / CH0358
    (SB0398 / CH0359)
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by MergerDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 358Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0859Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and ExemptionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0919
    (SB0971)
Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting DiscriminationDelegate Young, K.In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1149 / CH0837
    (SB0951 / CH0838)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsDelegate KramerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1184Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1190Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - FeesDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1249Corporations and Associations - Domestications - AuthorizationDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1260Annual Reports and Personal Property Reports - Fees, Exemption, and AffidavitDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1641Corporations and Associations - Nonprofit Corporations - Legislative AdvocacyDelegate LamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0357
    (HB0615)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0398 / CH0359
    (HB0759 / CH0358)
Corporations - Formation of a Holding Company by MergerSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0481
    (HB0744 / CH0674)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0656
    (HB0714)
Corporations and Associations - Fee for Processing Articles of Dissolution and Certificates of Cancellation - RepealSenator JenningsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0951 / CH0838
    (HB1149 / CH0837)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0971
    (HB0919)
Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting DiscriminationSenator KaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.