Gaming (C7)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0049Criminal Law - Gaming - Home GamesDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/2/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0127 / CH0613
    (SB0311)
Gaming - Home GamesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Ways and Means
2/2/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0187Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0202 / CH0479
    (SB1004)
Pilot Program - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Maryland Veterans Trust FundDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0242Criminal Law - Betting, Wagering, and Gambling - Civil OffenseDelegate MoonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0300
    (SB1108)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0451
    (SB0377 / CH0145)
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Revenue Distribution - Maryland State Arts CouncilSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0647
    (SB0543)
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of ProceedsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0728State Lottery - Licensed Agents - CommissionsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0761
    (SB0733)
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsCecil County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0764
    (SB0521)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules
HB0930Fantasy Competitions - Regulatory AuthorityDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1094Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants PG 313-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1330Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Recreational FacilitiesDelegate OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1490
    (SB0864 / CH0516)
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)Delegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1540
    (SB1025)
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership CostsAllegany County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1558Prince George's County - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data CollectionDelegate Howard, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1574
    (SB1070)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1636 / CH0314
    (SB1164)
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact GrantsDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0078 / CH0044State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted PrizesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0111 / CH0020State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Prize PaymentsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0265Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake IdentificationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0311
    (HB0127 / CH0613)
Gaming - Home GamesSenator KingIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
SB0319State Lottery - Licensed Agents - CommissionsSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0377 / CH0145
    (HB0451)
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Revenue Distribution - Maryland State Arts CouncilPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 145Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0445Gaming - Penny-Ante GamesSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
SB0521
    (HB0764)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0543
    (HB0647)
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of ProceedsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0733
    (HB0761)
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0864 / CH0516
    (HB1490)
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)Senator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0941 / CH0595Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming LicensesSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0976Commercial Daily Fantasy Sports - Authorization and RegulationSenator PetersIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0980Gaming - Traditional Noncommercial Fantasy Competitions - ClarificationSenator MillerIn the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1004
    (HB0202 / CH0479)
Pilot Program - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Maryland Veterans Trust FundSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1025
    (HB1540)
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership CostsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB1070
    (HB1574)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB1108
    (HB0300)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingIn the House - Favorable Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
SB1139Baltimore City - Commercial Bingo - PermitsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB1164
    (HB1636 / CH0314)
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District and Distribution of Local Impact GrantsSenator FergusonIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

October 16, 2016 10:48 A.M.