Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0286 / CH0809
    (SB0668 / CH0810)
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary IncreaseDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 809Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0513Circuit Court Judges - Election, Qualifications, and Term of OfficeDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0607Circuit Court Judges - Selection and TenureDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0640 / CH0822
    (SB0672 / CH0823)
Register of Wills - SalaryDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 822Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0770Courts - Appointments to Vacant Offices by the Judiciary - Same Party as PredecessorDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1071Courts - Business and Technology CourtDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1260District Court - Nonincarcerable Criminal Cases - SaturdaysDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1458District Court – County Zoning Violation – AppealsCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1779Judges - Mandatory Retirement AgeDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1825Public Information - Court Records - Name of Law Enforcement OfficerDelegate GrammerIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HJ0003 / JR0003
    (SJ0005)
Judicial Compensation Commission - RecommendationsSpeakerSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0035Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - District Court JurisdictionSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0125Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Interception of Communications - Firearms CrimesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0130Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0357Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0668 / CH0810
    (HB0286 / CH0809)
Circuit Court Clerks - Salary IncreaseSenator ZirkinEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 810Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0672 / CH0823
    (HB0640 / CH0822)
Register of Wills - SalarySenator ZirkinEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0005
    (HJ0003 / JR0003)
Judicial Compensation Commission - RecommendationsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing canceledBudget and Taxation

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2018 10:21 A.M.