Juvenile Law (E3)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0196Juveniles - Pretrial Detention - Confinement in Juvenile FacilitiesDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0261Juvenile Causes - Disposition on Delinquency Petition - Required ConsiderationsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0266
    (SB0498)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0304
    (SB0243)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0506Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Excluded Offenses - Natural Resources ViolationsDelegate GhristIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0634
    (SB0209)
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral ConsequencesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
HB0811Juvenile Services - Child Victims of Human TraffickingDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
HB1463
    (SB0317 / CH0063)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipDelegate PattersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1634 / CH0655
    (SB1072)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemDelegate JalisiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
SB0081Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination DateChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/21/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0149Juvenile Law - Citations for ViolationsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0189Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - LimitationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0209
    (HB0634)
Juvenile Law - Adjudication of Delinquency - Collateral ConsequencesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0243
    (HB0304)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0317 / CH0063
    (HB1463)
Coordinating Council for Juvenile Services Educational Programs - MembershipSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0325Juvenile Services Education - ModificationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0498
    (HB0266)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1072
    (HB1634 / CH0655)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.