Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0535 / CH0430
    (SB0538)
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility InstructionDelegate TurnerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0668Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Attorney's FeesDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0763Task Force to Study the Effectiveness of Teacher Education Programs in the Instruction of ReadingDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0934 / CH0465
    (SB0210 / CH0466)
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy ProtectionDelegate Young, K.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0967
    (SB0725)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for SchoolsDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1200
    (SB0806)
State Board of Education - High School Assessment - GovernmentDelegate KittlemanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0210 / CH0466
    (HB0934 / CH0465)
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Personal Electronic Account - Privacy ProtectionSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 466Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0363Great Preschools Tax Credit ProgramSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0493Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Annotated Code of MarylandSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0538
    (HB0535 / CH0430)
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility InstructionSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0691Maryland After-School and Summer Opportunity Fund Program - Funding RequirementSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0725
    (HB0967)
Baltimore County Board of Education - Procurement for Construction-Related Projects for SchoolsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0806
    (HB1200)
State Board of Education - High School Assessment - GovernmentSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0924County Boards of Education - Private Financing AuthoritySenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.