Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0054Baltimore City Public Schools - Health and Safety - Video CamerasDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB0221 / CH0199
    (SB0233)
Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health CentersDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0395
    (SB0293 / CH0740)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - ReportDelegate KellyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0418 / CH0209
    (SB0294 / CH0210)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate AdjustmentsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 209Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0657Cannabis - Use of State RevenuesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0680 / CH0791
    (SB1165 / CH0790)
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time LimitDelegate KaiserEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 791Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0746 / CH0806Public School Labor Relations Board - Administration and Enforcement - RevisionsDelegate Washington, M.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0834Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test RequirementDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
HB1094 / CH0338
    (SB0587 / CH0337)
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance StructureDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1289Higher Education - Student Financial Assistance - NotificationDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1301 / CH0760
    (SB0078)
Vehicle Laws - School Crossing Guards - Authority to Direct TrafficDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 760Environment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1329 / CH0571
    (SB0967 / CH0572)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Delegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 571Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
HB1381 / CH0608
    (SB0866 / CH0609)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Economic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1483
    (SB0522)
Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible InternshipsDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1543Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Installing Solar Panels on Baltimore City Public SchoolsDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1661
    (SB1191 / CH0732)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksDelegate Pena-MelnykVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0008Establishment of a Presidential Youth CouncilDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0078
    (HB1301 / CH0760)
Vehicle Laws - School Crossing Guards - Authority to Direct TrafficSenator RosapepeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0233
    (HB0221 / CH0199)
Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health CentersSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0244Task Force to Study Suspension Rates of African American Prekindergarten StudentsSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0263Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test RequirementSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
SB0293 / CH0740
    (HB0395)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Alternative Methodology - ReportSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 740Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0294 / CH0210
    (HB0418 / CH0209)
Child Care Subsidy Program - Reimbursement Rate AdjustmentsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 210Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0522
    (HB1483)
Income Tax Credit - Eligible Employers - Eligible InternshipsSenator KingIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0557Education - Maryland Education Opportunity Account Program - EstablishedSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0587 / CH0337
    (HB1094 / CH0338)
Education - Libraries - Reorganization of Governance StructureSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0866 / CH0609
    (HB1381 / CH0608)
Adult High School Pilot ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 609Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
SB0967 / CH0572
    (HB1329 / CH0571)
Heroin and Opioid Prevention Effort (HOPE) and Treatment Act of 2017Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 572Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1150Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and GuardiansSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1165 / CH0790
    (HB0680 / CH0791)
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time LimitSenator WaughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB1191 / CH0732
    (HB1661)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.