Ethics (G2)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0303
    (SB0854)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesDelegate TurnerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0879 / CH0031
    (SB0683)
Public Integrity Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0882
    (SB0805)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersDelegate KrimmIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
HB0976
    (SB0550)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1386 / CH0519Maryland Public Ethics Law - Members and Employees of Boards of License Commissioners and Liquor Control BoardsDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Environment and Transportation
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1631
    (SB1026)
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure StatementsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0018 / CH0283Public Ethics - Bicounty Commissions - Financial DisclosureChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2017 - 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0164Baltimore County - Ethics - Prohibitions and Requirements Regarding Payments During Pendency of Zoning ApplicationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0253
    (HB0438)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0550
    (HB0976)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0683
    (HB0879 / CH0031)
Public Integrity Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0805
    (HB0882)
Frederick County - Ethics - Prohibited Contributions to Planning Commission MembersSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0854
    (HB0303)
Departmental Secretaries - Campaign and Working Hour ActivitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1026
    (HB1631)
Public Ethics Law - Conflicts of Interest and Financial Disclosure StatementsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:51 P.M.