Financial Institutions (I1)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0188 / CH0478Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Disclosure and Sharing of InformationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0794Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task ForceDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1314
    (SB0772)
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a PartySpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB1450 / CH0393
    (SB0471 / CH0392)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset RepealDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393Economic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1451Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate VaughnIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0002
    (SJ0006)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0087 / CH0340Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - RepealChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0088 / CH0341Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special FundsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0471 / CH0392
    (HB1450 / CH0393)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Fund and Sunset RepealSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 392Finance
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0772
    (HB1314)
Financial Institutions - Single-Party and Multiple-Party Accounts - Right to Funds on Death of a PartyPresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB1132Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Exemption and FeeSenator MannoIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SJ0006
    (HJ0002)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.