Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB1285Consumer Protection - Consumer Reporting Agencies - Security Freezes - Call CenterDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1297 / CH0790Commercial Law - Consumer Loans and Credit - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate AumannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 790Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1511 / CH0844Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's FeeDelegate MautzEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 844Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1647Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsDelegate Howard, S.In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0566 / CH0845Credit Regulation - Mortgage Brokers - Finder's FeeSenator SerafiniEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 845Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0755 / CH0340Credit Regulation - Escrow Accounts - Water and Sewer Facilities AssessmentsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.