Commercial Law - Generally (I4)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0052
    (SB0065)
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - RepealChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0312
    (SB0077 / CH0008)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1019
    (SB0532)
Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
SB0065
    (HB0052)
Clerks of the Circuit Courts - Hospital Lien Docket - RepealChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0077 / CH0008
    (HB0312)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0532
    (HB1019)
Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0613
    (HB0786 / CH0103)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.