Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0189Hospitals - Substance Use Treatment Demonstration Program - RequirementsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0190 / CH0220Mammography Centers - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification of Breast Cancer Screening OptionsDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0221 / CH0199
    (SB0233)
Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health CentersDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 199Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0387Assisted Living Program Transparency ActDelegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0403 / CH0225
    (SB0369 / CH0226)
Maryland Patient Referral Law - Compensation Arrangements Under Federally Approved Programs and ModelsDelegate PendergrassApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0443 / CH0772Assisted Living Programs - Licensure FeesDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 772Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0515Hospitals - Establishment of Substance Use Treatment Program - RequirementsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0661Public Health - Suspected Overdoses - Reporting RequirementDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0808
    (SB0660)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0857 / CH0584Maryland Mental Health Law - Small Private Group Home - DefinitionDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0921
    (SB0623)
Hospitals - Community Benefit Report - Disclosure of Tax ExemptionsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0932
    (SB0379)
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Economic Impact StatementsDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1010Health - Certified Recovery Residences - Urine TestingDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1053Integrated Community Oncology Reporting ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.Finance
HB1276Health - Patient-Centered Opioid Addiction Treatment ActDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1278Public Health - Health Care Facilities and Health Care Systems - Availability of Buprenorphine PrescribersDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1460
    (SB0732)
Hospitals - Acquisitions of Physician Offices, Group Practices, and Outpatient Health Care Entities - NoticeDelegate KellyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
HB1489Medical Laboratories - Advertising or Solicitation of Business - Repeal of ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1599
    (SB1109)
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services ProvidedDelegate MorganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1647Nursing Homes - Lifting of Immobile Patients - RequirementsDelegate ValderramaIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0233
    (HB0221 / CH0199)
Maryland Council on Advancement of School-Based Health CentersSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0240Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - ReportSenator RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0369 / CH0226
    (HB0403 / CH0225)
Maryland Patient Referral Law - Compensation Arrangements Under Federally Approved Programs and ModelsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0379
    (HB0932)
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and PlacementSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (40-7)Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0623
    (HB0921)
Hospitals - Community Benefit Report - Disclosure of Tax ExemptionsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0660
    (HB0808)
Hospitals - Patient's Bill of RightsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0732
    (HB1460)
Hospitals - Acquisitions of Physician Offices, Group Practices, and Outpatient Health Care Entities - NoticeSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing canceledFinance
SB1020Maryland Health Care Regulatory Reform Act of 2017Senator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1109
    (HB1599)
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services ProvidedSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1150Hearing- or Speech-Impaired Children - Sign Language Instruction for Parents and GuardiansSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1198 / CH0019Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017Prince George's County SenatorsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.