Workers' Compensation (K1)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0039
    (SB0016 / CH0004)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Issuance, Renewal, and Cancellation of Policies - AuthorityDelegate JamesonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0219 / CH0089
    (SB0216)
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of SubpoenasDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Economic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0280
    (SB0215)
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Physician-Dispensed Prescriptions - LimitationsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0281
    (SB0217)
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Controlled Dangerous Substances Prescribed by Physicians - LimitationsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0341
    (SB0479 / CH0172)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Board StructureDelegate JamesonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0368
    (SB0482)
Workers' Compensation - Prescription Drugs - Choice of PharmacyDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0411
    (SB0494)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional OfficersDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0977 / CH0629Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police - Workers' Compensation - Lyme Disease Presumption - Repeal of Termination Date PG/MC 110-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Economic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1051Workers' Compensation - Baltimore County Deputy SheriffBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1289Workers' Compensation - Exclusivity of Compensation - Exception - Deliberate Act of EmployerDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1342
    (SB0507)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Repackaged and Relabeled Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsDelegate TarrantIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1445
    (SB1023)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional OfficersAllegany County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0016 / CH0004
    (HB0039)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Issuance, Renewal, and Cancellation of Policies - AuthoritySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0119 / CH0034Workers' Compensation - Subsequent Injury Fund - Billing Address NotificationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0130 / CH0038Commissioner of Labor and Industry and Workers' Compensation Commission - Reports of Accidental Injury or Disability - Electronic SharingChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0196Workers' Compensation - Volunteer Canteen and Rehabilitation PersonnelSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0215
    (HB0280)
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Physician-Dispensed Prescriptions - LimitationsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0216
    (HB0219 / CH0089)
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of SubpoenasSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0217
    (HB0281)
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Controlled Dangerous Substances Prescribed by Physicians - LimitationsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
SB0479 / CH0172
    (HB0341)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Board StructureSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 172Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0482
    (HB0368)
Workers' Compensation - Prescription Drugs - Choice of PharmacySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0494
    (HB0411)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - State Correctional OfficersSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0507
    (HB1342)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Repackaged and Relabeled Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1023
    (HB1445)
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Allegany County Correctional OfficersSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules
SB1099 / CH0374Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Paid Rescue Squad Members and Paid Advanced Life Support Unit MembersSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.