Special Taxing Districts (L4)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0602 / CH0354
    (SB0141 / CH0353)
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater ServicesAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 354Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB1198 / CH0304Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Extraordinary Development District PG/MC 109-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0141 / CH0353
    (HB0602 / CH0354)
Anne Arundel County - Special Taxing Districts - Water or Wastewater ServicesAnne Arundel County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.