Bi-County Agencies (L5)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0973 / CH0628Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Commission Infractions - Watershed Regulations PG/MC 102-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0974Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Upgrade of Facilities PG/MC 108-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB0975Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Customer Affordability Program PG/MC 103-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
HB1043 / CH0441Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1334Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking PG/MC 112-14Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1071Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014Senator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.