Local Government - Generally (L6)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0046 / CH0248Animal Control Units - Impounded Animals - IdentificationDelegate ChangApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0105 / CH0535
    (SB0173 / CH0534)
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Commercial Property Owners - Renewable Energy ProjectsDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0129Staggered Election Terms - Charter County CouncilsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0243
    (SB0166)
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial ReviewDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0278
    (SB0415)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0376Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - IncreaseDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0387 / CH0593
    (SB0912 / CH0592)
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - StudyDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 593Economic Matters
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0465
    (SB0652)
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card - Failure to IssueDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0502Cable Television - Equipment RentalsDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
HB0605 / CH0443
    (SB0859 / CH0442)
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative AppealsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0663
    (SB0580)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0666
    (SB0581)
Local Governments - Legal Notice RequirementsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0485 / CH0677)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceDelegate KellyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0835 / CH0569
    (SB0631 / CH0568)
Local Facility Closure Reserve Funds - Investments and ReinvestmentsCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 569Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0913
    (SB0366)
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development ProjectsDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB1176Rental Deposit Assistance Loan Programs and FundDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1395 / CH0738Local Government - Disparity Grants - AmountsDelegate AndertonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB1407Economic Development - Business Improvement DistrictsDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1413State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1636 / CH0314
    (SB1164)
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District and Distribution of Local Impact GrantsDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0104 / CH0018Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - FinancingChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0166
    (HB0243)
Land Use Actions - Legislative Bodies - Judicial ReviewSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0173 / CH0534
    (HB0105 / CH0535)
Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Commercial Property Owners - Renewable Energy ProjectsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 534Finance
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0366
    (HB0913)
Land Use - Department of Planning - Permit for Development ProjectsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0415
    (HB0278)
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesSenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
SB0485 / CH0677
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0580
    (HB0663)
Constitution - Local Government - Legal NoticesSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0581
    (HB0666)
Local Governments - Legal Notice RequirementsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0631 / CH0568
    (HB0835 / CH0569)
Local Facility Closure Reserve Funds - Investments and ReinvestmentsSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 568Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0652
    (HB0465)
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card - Failure to IssueSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0779Land Use - Proposed Development Project - Transit and Traffic Adequacy StudiesSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0810Marlow Heights Police Department - EstablishmentSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0859 / CH0442
    (HB0605 / CH0443)
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative AppealsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 442Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0912 / CH0592
    (HB0387 / CH0593)
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - StudySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 592Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1164
    (HB1636 / CH0314)
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Benefits District and Distribution of Local Impact GrantsSenator FergusonIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-2)Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.