Local Government - Generally (L6)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0167 / CH0776Counties and Municipalities - At-Will Supervisory Employees - Residency RequirementsDelegate McCrayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 776Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0260
    (SB0780)
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local AuditsDelegate QueenIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsAppropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0317Labor and Employment - Wages and Benefits - Preemption of Local AuthorityDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0386 / CH0444Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0434
    (SB0062)
Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on RestrictionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0435Governmental Procedures - Security of Computerized Data - Encryption of Personal InformationDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0446 / CH0178
    (SB0909 / CH0177)
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety OfficialsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0507Community Colleges and Local Governments - Unfair Labor Practices - ProhibitionDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0843
    (SB0635)
Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While DrivingDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0930
    (SB0640)
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight VehiclesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1154 / CH0407Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Use of Grant FundsDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1181Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement ZonesDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1350 / CH0392
    (SB0851)
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive PlanDelegate RoseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 392Economic Matters
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1592
    (SB0931)
Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating StationsDelegate JamesonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0062
    (HB0434)
Real Property - Backyard Gardens - Prohibition on RestrictionsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0136Vehicle Laws - Parking Violations - Authority of Political SubdivisionsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Lee)Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0532Temporary Family Health Care Structures - PermitsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0635
    (HB0843)
Task Force to Study the Adoption of Enforcement Tools to Record Video of Illegal Cell Phone Use While DrivingSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0640
    (HB0930)
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight VehiclesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0780
    (HB0260)
Local Government - Sexual Assault Cases - Local AuditsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0851
    (HB1350 / CH0392)
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive PlanSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0909 / CH0177
    (HB0446 / CH0178)
Charles County - Collective Bargaining for Public Safety OfficialsCharles County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 177Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0931
    (HB1592)
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive PlanSenator AstleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.