Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 37

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0103Chesapeake Bay Trust - Restrictions on Investments - RepealDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0207 / CH0408
    (SB0106)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - ExpansionDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0238Forest Conservation Act - Exemption - Hazards to Air NavigationDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0302
    (SB0028)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsDelegate SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0356 / CH0243
    (SB0254)
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - ExtensionDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 243Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBudget and Taxation
HB0449 / CH0481
    (SB0409 / CH0480)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0513Natural Resources - Forest Harvesting - Public Notice of Process and LicenseesDelegate AumannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0631
    (SB0357)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0796Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and CompensationDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0815
    (SB0694 / CH0193)
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit AmountDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0832Natural Resources - Licensed Tree Experts - Insurance and FeesDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0860 / CH0461Aquatic Invasive Species - Decontamination of Vessels (State Lakes Invasive Species Act of 2015)Delegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0881
    (SB0256)
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation ActDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0962Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Lot Coverage - Exclusion for Driveways Constructed of Decking MaterialDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0963Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Lot Coverage - Calculation for Swimming PoolsDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1008Recreational Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Voter RegistrationDelegate MautzIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1091
    (SB0134)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1145
    (SB0903)
State Board of Tree Experts - EstablishmentDelegate FrushIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
HB1169
    (SB0801)
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington CountyDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1254State Boat Act - Registered Vessel - Disclosure of Owner InformationDelegate ArentzIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0028
    (HB0302)
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0029Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0083 / CH0322Environment - Vibrio Public Information CampaignSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 322Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0106
    (HB0207 / CH0408)
Chesapeake Bay Trust - Investment Options - ExpansionSenator AstleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0134
    (HB1091)
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to CountiesSenator EdwardsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0171Program Open Space - Baltimore City - Purchase Talbot Road PropertySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0254
    (HB0356 / CH0243)
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - ExtensionSenator EdwardsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0256
    (HB0881)
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation ActSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0357
    (HB0631)
Program Open Space - Baltimore City Grants - Increase and Inflation AdjustmentSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0409 / CH0480
    (HB0449 / CH0481)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsSenator MontgomeryEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0509Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and CompensationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0600 / CH0370Chesapeake Bay Trust and Chesapeake Conservation Corps - FundingSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0694 / CH0193
    (HB0815)
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling - Credit AmountSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 193Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0712Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0801
    (HB1169)
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington CountySenator SerafiniIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0862 / CH0389Maryland Park Service - Operations Revenue - Mandated AppropriationSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0903
    (HB1145)
State Board of Tree Experts - EstablishmentSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.