Estates and Trusts (N2)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0033 / CH0760Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental FacilityDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 760Health and Government Operations
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0225 / CH0807
    (SB0173 / CH0808)
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationDelegate JacobsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0444 / CH0256
    (SB0348 / CH0257)
Estates and Trusts - Contesting Validity of Revocable Trust - LimitationDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0474 / CH0260
    (SB1014 / CH0261)
Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation PeriodDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 260Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0491 / CH0258
    (SB0267 / CH0259)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust ProvisionsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0550 / CH0819Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryCharles County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 819Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0556 / CH0233
    (SB0466)
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of FeesDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0567Estates and Trusts - Intestate Succession - Share of Surviving Spouse and Order of DistributionDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
HB0640 / CH0822
    (SB0672 / CH0823)
Register of Wills - SalaryDelegate DumaisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 822Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0691 / CH0444Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Fund - Donor Registry - Annual FundingDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 444Health and Government Operations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0720 / CH0167
    (SB0486 / CH0168)
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension FormulaAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0769 / CH0298Estates and Trusts - Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Award of Reasonable and Necessary ExpensesDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 298Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0777
    (SB0649)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0783
    (SB0109)
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - RepealDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0948 / CH0316Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and FeesDelegate MorganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1115 / CH0837Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18Howard County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1483 / CH0287Duties of a Guardian of the Person - VisitationDelegate SaabApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1613
    (SB1239 / CH0749)
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration ActionDelegate SanchezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0109
    (HB0783)
Estates and Trusts - Share of Intestate Estate Inherited by Surviving Parent - RepealSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
SB0173 / CH0808
    (HB0225 / CH0807)
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - CompensationSenator HersheyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0214Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable AdultsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0267 / CH0259
    (HB0491 / CH0258)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust ProvisionsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0292 / CH0551Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat TitlesSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0348 / CH0257
    (HB0444 / CH0256)
Estates and Trusts - Contesting Validity of Revocable Trust - LimitationSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0372 / CH0315Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and FeesSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0466
    (HB0556 / CH0233)
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of FeesSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0486 / CH0168
    (HB0720 / CH0167)
Allegany County - Orphans' Court Judges - Pension FormulaSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
SB0649
    (HB0777)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0672 / CH0823
    (HB0640 / CH0822)
Register of Wills - SalarySenator ZirkinEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1014 / CH0261
    (HB0474 / CH0260)
Estates and Trusts - Breach of Trust Action - Limitation PeriodSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 261Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1239 / CH0749
    (HB1613)
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian – Adverse Immigration ActionSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 749Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
4/9/2018 - 7:30 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.