Social Services - Generally (O1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0103Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - RenamingChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0134Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community DevelopmentChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0269
    (SB0531)
Housing Navigator and Aftercare ProgramDelegate KrimmIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0533Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0752
    (SB0671)
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial RecordsDelegate KellyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0762Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness Campaign Pilot ProgramDelegate PlattIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0860
    (SB0853)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Alteration of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Delegate LiermanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1067Shelter Services for Homeless Women - Feminine Hygiene ProductsDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1188Advisory Council on Couples Qualifying for Family Investment Administration BenefitsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1469
    (SB1009)
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass ThroughDelegate Young, P.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0441Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - EstablishmentSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0531
    (HB0269)
Housing Navigator and Aftercare ProgramSenator BensonIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB0625Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene ProductsSenator BensonIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
SB0671
    (HB0752)
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial RecordsSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0853
    (HB0860)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Senator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1009
    (HB1469)
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass ThroughSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1092Public Assistance Fraud Prevention ActSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

March 24, 2017 1:10 P.M.