Social Services - Generally (O1)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0242 / CH0153
    (SB0053 / CH0152)
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of ProgramDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 153Health and Government Operations
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0431 / CH0379
    (SB0308 / CH0380)
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Appropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0454
    (SB0490 / CH0497)
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying InformationDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0573Income Tax - Earned Income Tax Credit - Eligibility Awareness CampaignDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0659
    (SB0822)
Community Development - Community Action Agencies - Continuity of FundingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1273
    (SB0513)
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/15/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
HB1432Food Stamp Program - Summer Supplement for Children - Pilot ProgramDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1494
    (SB0964)
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot ProgramDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1528 / CH0696
    (SB1117 / CH0697)
Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage PreventionDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 696Economic Matters
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1577Human Services - Family Navigation Services - Provision and FundingDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1582 / CH0407Human Services - Children Receiving Child Welfare Services - Centralized Comprehensive Health Care Monitoring ProgramDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 407Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1589Maryland Office for Refugees and Asylees - Placement Information (Unaccompanied Alien Children Placement Transparency Act)Delegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1601State Department of Education - Guidelines on Trauma-Informed ApproachDelegate WilkinsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1615 / CH0408
    (SB1231)
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1729
    (SB1164)
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - FundingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1797Task Force to Improve Baltimore City Homeless Transitions From Low-Barrier Shelters to Permanent HousingDelegate GlennIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0053 / CH0152
    (HB0242 / CH0153)
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program Fund - Alteration of ProgramSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 152Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0085 / CH0369Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - EligibilityChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0308 / CH0380
    (HB0431 / CH0379)
Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - Employment Program (Fostering Employment Act of 2018)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
SB0412Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services OversightSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0490 / CH0497
    (HB0454)
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying InformationSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0513
    (HB1273)
Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - ProhibitionSenator WaughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0587Department of Human Services - Baltimore City Department of Social Services - AuditSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0822
    (HB0659)
Community Development - Community Action Agencies - Continuity of FundingSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0964
    (HB1494)
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and ReportsSenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1034Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest WarrantSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1117 / CH0697
    (HB1528 / CH0696)
Electric Universal Service Program - Funds - Arrearage PreventionSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 697Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB1164
    (HB1729)
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - FundingSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
SB1231
    (HB1615 / CH0408)
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance ProgramSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.