Elderly (O2)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0271
    (SB0276)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0723 / CH0421Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - RequirementsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0013Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory CommitteeChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0276
    (HB0271)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.