Elderly (O2)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0262
    (SB0805)
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - AlterationDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0284Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of ViolenceDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0588Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0685Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging PopulationDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0978
    (SB0604)
Task Force to Study Housing, Health, and Economic Stability of Maryland SeniorsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0098 / CH0017Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - AlterationChair, Finance CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0604
    (HB0978)
Task Force on the Distribution of Funding for Senior Citizen Activities CentersSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0805
    (HB0262)
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - AlterationSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1109 / CH0468Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment ProgramChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.