Disabled (O3)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0257 / CH0094St. Mary's County - Adult Public Guardianship Review Board - Membership RequirementsSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1277Sales and Use Tax - Ammunition - Developmental Disabilities FundingDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1460
    (SB1010)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesDelegate RudolphIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB1010
    (HB1460)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.