Disabled (O3)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0022 / CH0520
    (SB0147)
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training OversightDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Health and Government Operations
1/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0431 / CH0039
    (SB0355)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - EstablishmentDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 39Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0099 / CH0038Department of Disabilities - Assistive Technology Loan Program - Board of DirectorsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0147
    (HB0022 / CH0520)
Ethan Saylor Alliance for Self-Advocates as Educators - Membership and Duties - Community Inclusion Training OversightSenator HoughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0264Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False RepresentationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0355
    (HB0431 / CH0039)
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - EstablishmentSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.