Children (O4)

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0428 / CH0114Child Abuse and Neglect - Reports and Records - Disclosure to Public Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate Kelly, K.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0433
    (SB0412)
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - ProhibitionDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0823 / CH0545
    (SB0764 / CH0544)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless YouthDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0897
    (SB0570)
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and DisciplineDelegate HoughIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1460
    (SB1010)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesDelegate RudolphIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0412
    (HB0433)
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - ProhibitionSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0442Residential Child Care Programs - Memorandum of UnderstandingSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0570
    (HB0897)
Professional Licensing and Certification Governing Bodies - Child Abuse Mandated Reporter Training and DisciplineSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0764 / CH0544
    (HB0823 / CH0545)
Task Force to Study Housing and Supportive Services for Unaccompanied Homeless YouthSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1010
    (HB1460)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.