Children (O4)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0057Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - RegulationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0454
    (SB0490 / CH0497)
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying InformationDelegate MoonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0524 / CH0815
    (SB0291 / CH0816)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815Judiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0806Education - Summer Meals Expansion Grant Pilot ProgramDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0941 / CH0396Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – EligibilityDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1476Education - Supplemental Prekindergarten Grant - EligibilityDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1501Hospitals - Education - Child Safety Seat RequirementsDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
HB1517 / CH0693
    (SB0977 / CH0692)
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – ReportsDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 693Health and Government Operations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1577Human Services - Family Navigation Services - Provision and FundingDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1589Maryland Office for Refugees and Asylees - Placement Information (Unaccompanied Alien Children Placement Transparency Act)Delegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1610State–Occupied Buildings – Child Care Centers – Requirements and RenovationsDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1685 / CH0558
    (SB0912 / CH0559)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Delegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1747 / CH0799Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - ExceptionsDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 799Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0085 / CH0369Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - EligibilityChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0291 / CH0816
    (HB0524 / CH0815)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0412Task Force on Baltimore City Department of Social Services OversightSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0490 / CH0497
    (HB0454)
Child Abuse and Neglect – Disclosure of Identifying InformationSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0912 / CH0559
    (HB1685 / CH0558)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Senator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0977 / CH0692
    (HB1517 / CH0693)
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements - Children and Young Adults - ReportsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 692Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 12:59 P.M.