State Government - General Assembly (P5)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0027Open Meetings Act - Minutes - Required Internet PostingsDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 3:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/1/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
HB0084Constitutional Convention - Approval by Majority of Voters Voting on the Question - RequirementDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0278
    (SB0391)
General Assembly Standing Committees - Posting of Written Testimony on Web SiteDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0360Baltimore City Public School System - Audit Exemption - ProhibitionDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0361General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0385
    (SB0252)
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0420
    (SB0303)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0430
    (SB0306)
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0706General Assembly - Limitation of TermsDelegate VogtIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0792 / CH0524Office of Legislative Audits - Performance Audits - Local Alcoholic Beverages Licensing BoardsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0933General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of MeetingsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0962Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in MarylandDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0001
    (SJ0001)
National Day of the CowboyDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0002 / JR0003
    (SJ0002 / JR0002)
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - RepealDelegate FrickSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 3Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0007United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0009 / JR0005The Protection of the Federal Affordable Care ActDelegate MoonSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 5Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HJ0010
    (SJ0008 / JR0004)
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission RequestDelegate BarveIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsRules and Executive Nominations
4/8/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HS0001In Re: Delegate Dan K. Morhaim Resolution of ReprimandSpeakerIn the House - Adopted (138-0)
SB0074 / CH0631Maryland Code - Standardization of Terminology - NonprofitsSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Finance
1/19/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0146Congressional Districting ProcessSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0252
    (HB0385)
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0303
    (HB0420)
Commonsense Spending Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0306
    (HB0430)
Fiscal Responsibility Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0391
    (HB0278)
General Assembly Standing Committees - Posting of Written Testimony on Web SiteSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0493 / CH0061Annual Curative BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0494 / CH0062Annual Corrective BillPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62RulesRules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1023Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting ProcessSenator ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
SB1034 / CH0816Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission - Funding and Video StreamingSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 816Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0001
    (HJ0001)
National Day of the CowboySenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0002 / JR0002
    (HJ0002 / JR0003)
Constitutional Convention - Amendments - RepealSenator MadalenoSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 2Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
SJ0003United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Limitations on Federal PowerSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SJ0007Protection of the Federal Affordable Care ActSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
SJ0008 / JR0004
    (HJ0010)
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission RequestSenator PinskySigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 4Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/8/2017 - 10:00 a.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

June 15, 2017 11:01 A.M.