Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0314 / CH0479
    (SB0267 / CH0478)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed DwellingsDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0321 / CH0595
    (SB0616)
Frederick County - Property Tax - Exemption for Property Owned by Affordable Housing Land TrustFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0473
    (SB0787)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB0573Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0691
    (SB0605 / CH0538)
Property Tax Credit - Upper Stories of Commercial Structures - RehabilitationAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0707Restoring and Sustaining Baltimore City Communities Act of 2014Delegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0742 / CH0531
    (SB0600 / CH0530)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
HB0832Baltimore City - Property Tax - AssessorsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0833 / CH0617Baltimore City - Tax-Exempt Property - Certification of UseDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 617Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0863 / CH0618Property Tax - Exemption - Community-Managed Open SpaceDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0887Corporate Income Tax - Main Street Employer Tax RebateDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0920 / CH0623
    (SB0961)
Baltimore City Residential Retention ActDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 623Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0932 / CH0431Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Senior Citizens Receiving Social Security BenefitsDelegate MurphyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 431Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0936 / CH0624Baltimore City - Homestead Assessment Cap Increase and Property Tax Rate Reduction - StudyDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0943Baltimore City - Property Tax Equity - StudyDelegate McIntoshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1012Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Qualified Residential Property PG 414-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1247
    (SB0981)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal SystemDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0201Baltimore City - Homestead Property Tax Credit - Transfer to Newly Purchased DwellingSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation
SB0267 / CH0478
    (HB0314 / CH0479)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Newly Constructed DwellingsBaltimore City SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0315Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fee - County Tax LimitationsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0600 / CH0530
    (HB0742 / CH0531)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0605 / CH0538
    (HB0691)
Property Tax Credit - Commercial Structures - RehabilitationSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 538Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0616
    (HB0321 / CH0595)
Frederick County - Property Tax - Exemption for Property Owned by Affordable Housing Land TrustSenator BrinkleyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0787
    (HB0473)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0961
    (HB0920 / CH0623)
Baltimore City Residential Retention ActSenator FergusonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0981
    (HB1247)
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal SystemSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.