Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0117 / CH0229
    (SB0394 / CH0228)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - School Public Safety OfficersDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0176Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0208Prince George's County - Property Tax - Homeowners Property Tax Credit Supplement PG 407-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0210Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax Rate PG 400-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0220 / CH0126Montgomery County - Housing Opportunities Commission of Montgomery County - Subsidiary Entities MC 18-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0231Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 405-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0457
    (SB0813)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homestead Tax Credit PercentageDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0464
    (SB0189)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income EmployeesDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0475Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Accrual of Property Tax, Interest, and PenaltiesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0583
    (SB0815)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit SupplementDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0918Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1050
    (SB1022)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Public Safety OfficersDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1147 / CH0318
    (SB0887 / CH0319)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of DisabilityDelegate WivellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 318Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1208
    (SB0810)
Job Reinvestment Act of 2018Delegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1434Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Housing for Victims of Domestic Violence PG 432-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1669
    (SB0599 / CH0709)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 70 Years OldDelegate JalisiIn the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Walker)Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0179Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics ProgramsSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0189
    (HB0464)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income EmployeesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
SB0394 / CH0228
    (HB0117 / CH0229)
Baltimore City – Property Tax Credit – School Public Safety OfficersSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0599 / CH0709
    (HB1669)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Credit for Individuals at Least 70 Years OldSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0810
    (HB1208)
Job Reinvestment Act of 2018Senator ZuckerIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0813
    (HB0457)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homestead Tax Credit PercentageSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0815
    (HB0583)
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit SupplementSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0887 / CH0319
    (HB1147 / CH0318)
Washington County - Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Minimum Percentage of DisabilityWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 319Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0928Prince George’s County – Property Tax Credit – Grocery StoresSenator BensonIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0942Property Tax - Electronic Notification of Tax SalesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
SB1022
    (HB1050)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Public Safety OfficersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1053 / CH0735Property Tax Credit - 9-1-1 Public Safety TelecommunicatorsSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 735Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1143 / CH0616Property Tax Credit - Baltimore County - Leadership Through Athletics, Inc.Senator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:36 A.M.