Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0055 / CH0238
    (SB0054)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 238Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0110Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - ExtensionDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0406 / CH0362
    (SB0315)
Clean Cars Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
HB0627 / CH0522Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response TripsDelegate Howard, C.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0911Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealDelegate MorganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1360
    (SB0449 / CH0663)
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee ExemptionDelegate HixsonIn the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0054
    (HB0055 / CH0238)
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - DefinitionSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0284Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0315
    (HB0406 / CH0362)
Clean Cars Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
SB0393 / CH0363Clean Cars Act of 2017Senator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0449 / CH0663
    (HB1360)
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee ExemptionSenator KasemeyerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 663Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

May 25, 2017 12:51 P.M.