Transportation - Highways (R1)

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0049Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0259
    (SB0264)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From TollsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0264Dorchester County - Authorized Use of Highway User Revenues - Highway LightingDorchester County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0290 / CH0719
    (SB0536)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemDelegate GrammerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 719Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0402
    (SB0307 / CH0030)
Repeal of the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 (Road Kill Bill Repeal)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
HB0543State Highway Administration - Watkins Mill Road Interchange ProjectDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0830 / CH0755
    (SB0386)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 755Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0942
    (SB0564)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to MunicipalitiesDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0946
    (SB0563)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to MunicipalitiesDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0947Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local JurisdictionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0951 / CH0711
    (SB1157 / CH0712)
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - DedicationDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 711Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1050
    (SB1065)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1133Washington County - State Highway Rights-of-Way - Tree Planting and SignsDelegate WivellIn the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1251The Roadkill Bill of 2017Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1322
    (SB0586)
Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland ActDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
HB1334 / CH0761State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Decorative TreatmentsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1374State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification ActDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0264
    (HB0259)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Public School Buses - Exemption From TollsSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0292Transportation - Baltimore Harbor Tunnel, Fort McHenry Tunnel, and Francis Scott Key Bridge - Annual Pass StudySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0307 / CH0030
    (HB0402)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SB0328 / CH0555State Highways - Dedication - Henrietta Lacks WaySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0386
    (HB0830 / CH0755)
Pollinator Habitat Plans - Plan Contents - Requirements and ProhibitionSenator Nathan-PulliamVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0430State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome CentersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0431Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming RightsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0535Highway Dedication - Senator Norman R. Stone, Jr. HighwaySenator SallingIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0536
    (HB0290 / CH0719)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemSenator SallingIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0563
    (HB0946)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to MunicipalitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0564
    (HB0942)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to MunicipalitiesSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0586
    (HB1322)
Local Infrastructure Fast Track for Maryland ActSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1065
    (HB1050)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1090Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll PlazasSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1157 / CH0712
    (HB0951 / CH0711)
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - DedicationSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 712Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
SJ0006Dedication - Henrietta Lacks WaySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:44 A.M.