Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0250Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Concurrent JurisdictionDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0324Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - PenaltiesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0595Evidence - Violation of Ignition Interlock System RequirementDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Judiciary
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0711Driving While Impaired by Alcohol - Transporting a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0862Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - DefinitionDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1204Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New TechnologiesDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1205
    (SB0722)
Motor Vehicles - Alcohol- or Drug-Related Driving Offenses - Testing RequirementDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1391Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition InterlockDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1447Ignition Interlock System Program - Administrative Offenses - Out-of-State Licensed DriversDelegate VallarioIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0296
    (HB0349)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - Senate Requests House RecedeJudicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0722
    (HB1205)
Motor Vehicles – Alcohol– or Drug–Related Driving Offenses – Testing RequirementSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
SB1150Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.

April 9, 2018 11:09 P.M.