Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 39

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
HB0001Motor Vehicles - Special Registration Plates - Confederate Battle FlagDelegate BarveIn the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0058 / CH0608Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and InspectionsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0088Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the RoadDelegate ChangIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
HB0179Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck EligibilityDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
HB0181Motor Vehicles - Registration Cards - Digital or Electronic ImagesDelegate TarlauIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
HB0253 / CH0257
    (SB0309)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 257Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0392
    (SB0274)
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement OfficersDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0425Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Vehicle Manufactured Without Means to Display Front PlateDelegate MorganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0525 / CH0720
    (SB0730)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersDelegate BeidleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 720Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0627
    (SB0708)
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and InstructorsDelegate GilchristIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0675 / CH0494
    (SB0414)
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair ContractsDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 494Economic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0732
    (SB0153)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0805
    (SB0774 / CH0231)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsDelegate BeidleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB0896Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation of Consent to Experimental Emergency Medical TreatmentDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0967
    (SB0423)
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop ProceduresDelegate CassillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB0982
    (SB0666)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
HB1039Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop Procedures and Basic Vehicle MaintenanceDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1042Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax - Leased VehiclesDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1102Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and PollinatorsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1122Voting Disclosure Act of 2016Delegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB1165Vehicle Laws - Lapse or Termination of Required Security - NoticeDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1224Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2016Delegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
HB1342
    (SB0945 / CH0512)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Delegate KramerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1461Commercial Drivers' Licenses - Cancellations and Downgrades (Driving Privilege Preservation Act of 2016)Delegate FoldenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
HB1627Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent RegistrationDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
SB0023Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Out-of-State Vehicle RegistrationsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0080 / CH0158Commercial Drivers' Licenses - Cancellations and Downgrades (Driving Privilege Preservation Act of 2016)Chair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0153
    (HB0732)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0274
    (HB0392)
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Retired Law Enforcement OfficersSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
SB0309
    (HB0253 / CH0257)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - City of CrisfieldSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0389
    (HB0459 / CH0316)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
SB0414
    (HB0675 / CH0494)
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair ContractsSenator BrochinIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
SB0423
    (HB0967)
Motor Vehicles - Driver Education Program Curriculum - Police Traffic Stop ProceduresSenator NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0666
    (HB0982)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
SB0708
    (HB0627)
Vehicle Laws - Drivers' Education Schools and InstructorsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0730
    (HB0525 / CH0720)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersSenator NormanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0774 / CH0231
    (HB0805)
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and RequirementsSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
SB0945 / CH0512
    (HB1342)
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)Senator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:03 P.M.